THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 2:57:16 AM
Kumar, Cauhalagala Lakshmanasetty Prasanna
CPSO#:
23759
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Feb 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
02 Jul 1971
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Kannada, Telugu
Education: Mysore University, 1961
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:
Records Management Ltd
13-1 High Meadow Place
Toronto ON M9L 0A3
Tel: 1-(800)-775-0093
Fax: 1-(888)-316-4125
Website: www.recordsregistry.ca
Date Received: 23 Oct 2017
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:02 Dec 1970 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1968 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jul 1971 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Feb 2018 |
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: December 10, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Cauhalagala Lakshmanasetty Prasanna Kumar to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective December 10, 2018:
College investigations were conducted into whether Dr. Kumar engaged in professional misconduct and/or was incompetent in his obstetrical/gynaecological practice.
In the face of these allegations, Dr. Kumar resigned from the College on February 1, 2018 and has agreed never to apply or re- apply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.
Download Full Document (PDF)