THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 19:47:55 PM
Polevoy, Terry Alan
CPSO#:
23685
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jul 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
20 Jun 1990
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Unknown
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Wayne State University School of Medicin, 1970
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Records Management Ltd.
Unit 13
1 High Meadow Place
North York, ON M9L 0A3
Tel: 1 800 775 0093
Waterloo Walk-In Clinic
170 University Ave. W.
Waterloo, ON N2L 3E9
Tel: 519-725-1514
Fax: 519-725-5137
Date Received: 12 Nov 2015
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:06 Nov 1974 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1970 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jun 1971 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 22 Dec 1977 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Jun 1990 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jul 2020 |