THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 5:21:17 AM
Winning, John Barry
CPSO#:
23673
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
28 Jun 1971
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Cape Town Faculty of Healt, 1963
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Winning Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 15 2016
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Ontario Medical Imaging
Suite 309
328 Highway 7 East
Richmond Hill ON L4B 3P7
Date Received: 24 May 2016
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:06 Nov 1974 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 02 Aug 1969 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Jul 1970 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 01 Mar 1971 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 May 1971 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Jun 1971 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2016 |