THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 5:42:50 AM
Pollock, Isaac David
CPSO#:
23636
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
02 Jun 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Jun 1971
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1970
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Phone: 416-617-4217
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: I. David Pollock Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 1 2022
Medical Records Location
Date Received: 01 Jun 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jun 1970 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jun 1971 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 02 Jun 2022 |