THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 9:00:23 AM
Beecroft, David John
CPSO#:
23618
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
02 Jan 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
22 Jun 1971
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1970
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: D. John Beecroft Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 29 2019
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Dr. Beecroft closed his private practice in 2014. Medical records and care of active patients were transferred to Dr. Scheeres at that time. Patients looking to obtain a copy of their file may contact Dr. Scheeres at: 705-739-7611.
Patients who did not continue their care with Dr. Scheeres may send a written medical record request to Dr. Beecroft at: 13 Sutton Heights, Midhurst , ON, L9X 1S2
Date Received: 22 Nov 2018
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1973 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1970 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Jun 1971 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 02 Jan 2019 |