THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 8:02:03 AM
Jefferies, John William Tasker
CPSO#:
23609
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
22 Jun 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
18 Jun 1971
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1970
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. John Jefferies Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 11 2015
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:
197 Belmoral Drive, Orillia, ON L3V 5P9
Date Received: 19 Jun 2015
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:10 Mar 1975 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1970 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jun 1971 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jun 1971 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 22 Jun 2015 |