THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 9:47:16 AM
Eyjolfson, Ronald Clayton Eysteinn
CPSO#:
23580
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of
09 Aug 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
08 Jun 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Icelandic
Education: University of Manitoba, 1966
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Hospital Privileges
Hospital Notices
Source: Hospital
Active Date: September 8, 2010
Expiry Date:
Summary:
On September 15, 2010, Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre notified the College that Dr. Ronald Clayton Eysteinn Eyjolfson's privileges were suspended from September 8, 2010 to September 29, 2010.
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jun 1971 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 14 Aug 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Sep 2009 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 08 Jun 2011 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 08 Jun 2011 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 09 Aug 2012 |