THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 9:40:44 AM
Kryworuchko, Alexandra
CPSO#:
23567
MEMBER STATUS
Suspended as of
26 Sep 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
30 Oct 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Czech, English, French, Italian, Russian, Slovak, Spanish, Ukrainian
Education: University of Ottawa, 1970
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:DocuDavit Solutions
28 Eugene Street
Toronto, Ontario
M6B 3Z4
Tel: (416) 781-9083
Toll Free: 1-888-781-9083
Fax: 1-866-297-9338
Website: http://www.docudavit.com
Date Received: 08 Dec 2011
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1970 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1971 |
Suspension of registration imposed: Board of Inquiry |
Effective: 04 Jul 2008 |
Suspension of registration removed |
Effective: 12 Aug 2008 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 30 Oct 2009 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Oct 2009 |
Suspension of registration imposed: Executive Committee |
Effective: 12 Jun 2010 |
Suspension of registration removed |
Effective: 26 Sep 2011 |
Suspension of registration imposed: Fitness to Practise Committee |
Effective: 26 Sep 2011 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Fitness to Practice
Decision Date: 07 Apr 2011
Summary:
On April 6, 2011, the Fitness to Practise Committee found that Dr. Kryworuchko is incapacitated, as defined in s. 1(1) of the Health Professions Procedural Code.
On September 26, 2011, the Committee directed the Registrar to suspend Dr. Kryworuchko's certificate of registration for an indefinite period, with the provision that any future removal of the suspension will require an objective demonstration to the satisfaction of the College that safe practice could be assured.
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): January 17-21, January 31-February 4, 2011