THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 1:37:30 AM
Rennie, James Stuart
CPSO#:
23564
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
02 Oct 1987
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
02 Oct 1987
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1970
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
300 North Service Road West
Oakville ON L6M 2S2
Phone: (905) 338-3730
Fax: (905) 338-3731
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JAMES STUART RENNIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RENNIE is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1970 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1971 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 24 Jul 1975 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jan 1976 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 29 Jun 1977 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Sep 1980 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 24 Jun 1981 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Oct 1987 |