THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 6:18:01 AM
Krieger, Henry
CPSO#:
23562
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Jun 1971
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
11 Sep 1974
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Toronto, 1970
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
3030 Lawrence Avenue East
Suite 318
Scarborough ON M1P 2T7
Phone: (416) 289-2166
Fax: (416) 289-2168
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Scarborough Health Network |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:01 Jan 1974 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Hematology |
Effective:01 Jan 1974 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. HENRY KRIEGER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KRIEGER is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1970 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1971 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 30 Jul 1972 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Sep 1974 |