THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 8:37:56 AM
Leonard, Brian Clark
CPSO#:
23552
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Jun 1971
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
03 Jun 1976
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Ottawa, 1970
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
University of Ottawa Eye Institute
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8574
Fax: (613) 739-6645
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Ophthalmology |
Effective:05 Nov 1975 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. BRIAN CLARK LEONARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEONARD is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1970 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1971 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Nov 1974 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Jun 1976 |