THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 22:40:12 PM
Aye, Maung Tin
CPSO#:
23480
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
05 Jun 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
01 Apr 2004
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Cambridge School of Clinic, 1966
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1968 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Jul 1969 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Apr 1971 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Apr 2004 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 01 Apr 2004 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 05 Jun 2013 |