THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 18:55:30 PM
Aitken, Susan Elaine
CPSO#:
23459
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
30 Mar 1971
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1969
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:480 Brigitta Street
Ottawa, ON K2S 0H8
Date Received: 27 May 2015
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:09 Jun 1980 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1969 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Specified Certificate |
Effective: 03 Jun 1970 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Mar 1971 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2015 |