THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 19:06:00 PM
Waller, Douglas Frederick
CPSO#:
23421
MEMBER STATUS
Revoked: Discipline Committee as of
27 Jan 2003
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
14 Mar 2000
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicin, 1965
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurology |
Effective:22 Nov 1973 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Feb 1971 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Oct 1975 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 14 Mar 2000 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 14 Mar 2000 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 02 Oct 2002 |
Revoked: Discipline Committee. |
Effective: 27 Jan 2003 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 27 Jan 2003
Summary:
On January 27, 2003, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Waller committed acts of professional misconduct in that he sexually abused six patients, engaged in acts of sexual impropriety, failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession, had been convicted of an offence relevant to his suitability to practise medicine in that he has benn convicted of five counts of sexual assault under the Criminal Code; and commited acts relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. In addition, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Waller to be incompetent in his care of patients and displayed a lack of knowledge, skill or judgment or disregard for the welfare of patients.
The Discipline Committee ordered the following penalty; :
1) a reprimand, the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the Register;
2) revocation of the certificate of registration, effective immediately;
3) costs to the College in the amount of $1,500.00;
4) reimbursement to the College for funding for therapy and counselling for four of the patients (named in the Notice of Hearing) up to $7,000.00;
5) post security to guarantee payment of the amounts in [(4) above]
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Jan 27, 2003
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 07 Jul 1975
Summary:
On July 7, 1975, the Discipline Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario found Dr. Douglas Frederick Waller guilty of professional misconduct in that he engaged in an improper association with a patient and directed that he be suspended from the Register of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario for a period of three months and that he pay costs in the amount of $1000.00. The suspension commenced July 7, 1975.
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): 07 Jul 1975