THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 19:57:30 PM
Goel, Sadan Kumar
CPSO#:
23415
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jul 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
06 Mar 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi
Education: Vikram University, 1961
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:368 Wildwood Park
Winnipeg MB R3T 0E7
Phone 204- 869-4448
Date Received: 01 Jun 2020
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:10 Dec 1969 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 06 Feb 1966 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Feb 1971 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 06 Mar 2012 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 06 Mar 2012 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jul 2020 |
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: March 6, 2012
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Please see attached undertaking effective March 6, 2012.
Download Full Document (PDF)