THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 2:20:21 AM
Gabor, Andrew
CPSO#:
23282
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2002
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
13 Nov 1970
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Hungarian, Romanian
Education: Peter Pazmany University of Budapest, 1949
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:02 Dec 1968 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Nov 1970 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 27 Sep 1982 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Feb 1991 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2002 |