THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 6:15:54 AM
Gwizdal, Mary
CPSO#:
23262
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
01 Jun 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
04 Nov 1970
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Polish
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1964
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Mary Gwizdal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 3 2015
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:01 Jan 1970 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1964 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1965 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1966 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1968 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Nov 1970 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2015 |