THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 2:47:45 AM
Rabin, Elijah Zephania
CPSO#:
23173
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
07 Oct 1970
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Hebrew, Yiddish
Education: Queen's University, 1961
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. E. Z. Rabin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 18 2022
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Arizona
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:14 Nov 1966 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Oct 1970 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2022 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 23 Jun 2003
Summary:
On June 23, 2003, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Rabin did not engage in sexual abuse of a patient and, furthermore, that his conduct in that regard was not conduct unbecoming a physician contrary to the legislation.
The Discipline Committee did find that Dr. Rabin committed an act of professional misconduct that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as unprofessional regarding his writing of prescriptions for his common-law spouse.
On October 2, 2003, the Discipline Committee released its written decision and reasons including its decision on penalty. The Discipline Committee was of the opinion that Dr. Rabin had been punished sufficiently by the extensive publicity focusing on the allegations and, therefore, no further action on penalty should be taken.
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Jan 20, 2003