THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 4:26:13 AM
Merritt, Richard Davidson
CPSO#:
23111
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
01 Jun 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
26 Oct 1972
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1968
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Richard D. Merritt Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 9 2013
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients seeking medical records of Dr. Merritt are to send a request to the office of Dr. Amber Sheikh (94301) at:
Suite 305
4256 Portage Road
Niagara Falls, ON
L2E 6A4
Tel: (905) 358-6121
Date Received: 12 Jun 2013
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Ophthalmology |
Effective:06 Nov 1973 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Sep 1970 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 15 Dec 1971 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Dec 1971 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 29 Feb 1972 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1972 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Oct 1972 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2013 |