THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 6:45:10 AM
McCurrach, Anne Elizabeth Gilbert
CPSO#:
23072
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
15 Apr 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
29 Jul 1970
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Edinburgh, 1966
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients should first call Records Storage and Retrieval Services at 1-888-563-3732 to inquire if they have the medical record. If they do not have the medical record, then a written request can be sent to Dr. Shaghayegh Rezaie at Unit 212, 840 Coxwell Avenue, Toronto ON M4C 5T2.
Date Received: 22 Jul 2020
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1968 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jan 1970 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jul 1970 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 15 Apr 2019 |