THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 10:18:09 AM
Siu, Kien Gniap Jacques
CPSO#:
23062
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jul 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
27 Jul 1970
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Melbourne Faculty of Medic, 1966
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Kien G. Siu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 26 2020
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:
Scarborough General Hospital
Mental Health Services
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough, ON M1P 2V5
or
Northumberland Hills Hospital
Mental Health Services
1000 Depalma Drive
Colbourg, ON K9A 5W6
Date Received: 08 May 2020
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:19 Nov 1973 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jul 1970 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jul 2020 |