THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 3:22:57 AM
Hakes, John Anthony Allan
CPSO#:
23056
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
01 Jun 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
23 Jul 1970
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Bristol Medical School, University of Br, 1959
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: J.A. Hakes Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 9 2015
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Please contact the clinic at which the patient was treated at to access medical records.
Date Received: 20 Apr 2015
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:01 Dec 1970 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jan 1970 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Jul 1970 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2015 |