THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 7:22:45 AM
Maddison, George David
CPSO#:
23050
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
01 Jun 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
23 Jul 1970
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1964
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record should contact:
Brantford General Hospital
Medical Records Department
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford, ON
N3R 1G9
Tel: (519) 751-5544
Date Received: 08 Jul 2013
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:03 Dec 1968 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Vascular Surgery |
Effective:23 Nov 1983 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Jul 1970 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2013 |