THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 8:33:21 AM
Jewett, Michael Alexander Spencer
CPSO#:
22988
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
04 Jul 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
16 Sep 2022
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1968
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Jewett Gallie Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 25 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Urology |
Effective:07 Nov 1973 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1968 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Jul 1970 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 19 Mar 1974 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 Mar 1976 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 09 Aug 2022 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Sep 2022 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 04 Jul 2023 |