THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 2:16:04 AM
Salkauskis, Stanley John
CPSO#:
22873
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
11 Aug 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
11 Aug 2022
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Lithuanian
Education: University of Toronto, 1969
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1235 Wilson Ave
North York ON M3M 0B2
Phone: 416 242 1000
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:01 Nov 1983 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. STANLEY JOHN SALKAUSKIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SALKAUSKIS is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jul 1969 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Jun 1970 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 09 Aug 2022 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Aug 2022 |