THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 19:53:08 PM
Toguri, Allan Goro
CPSO#:
22871
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
26 Jun 1970
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Japanese
Education: University of Toronto, 1969
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Allan Toguri Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 4 2021
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact: Papersavers 380 Alden Road, Markham ON, L3R 4C1. 1-888-392-0828 or 905-513-1163.
Date Received: 29 Jan 2020
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Newfoundland and Labrador
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Urology |
Effective:11 Nov 1976 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 25 Jun 1969 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Jun 1970 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2023 |