THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 20:13:22 PM
Johnston, David George
CPSO#:
22850
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
22 Feb 2002
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1969
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Medical records location as per above.
St. Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
Health Records
100 West 5th St
Hamilton, ON L9C 0E3
Date Received: 24 Apr 2018
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:20 Nov 1973 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 16 Jun 1969 to 15 Jun 1970
Other - Comprehensive Internship
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jun 1969 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Jun 1970 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 21 Aug 1978 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Feb 2002 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2018 |