THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 2:11:17 AM
Bruni, Joseph
CPSO#:
22811
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
22 Jun 1970
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Jun 1970
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Italian
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1969
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
55 Queen Street East
Suite 927
Toronto ON M5C 1R6
Phone: (416) 864-5501
Fax: (416) 864-5631
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Michael's Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:09 Nov 1976 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Neurology |
Effective:28 Nov 1977 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JOSEPH BRUNI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRUNI is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jul 1969 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 13 Jun 1970 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Jun 1970 |