THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 2:28:33 AM
Bhabha, Cassim Ahomed
CPSO#:
22809
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
22 Jun 1970
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Afrikaans, English, Gujarati, Hindi, Urdu
Education: University of the Witwatersrand Faculty, 1962
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Aug 1968 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Jun 1970 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2009 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 19 Apr 1991
Summary:
In April 1991, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Bhabha guilty of professional misconduct, as defined in s. 27(27) of Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he failed to provide within a reasonable time and without cause a report or certificate requested by a patient or his authorized agent in respect of an examination or treatment performed by him. Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. Bhabha be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the Register. The Committee also ruled that the Doctor be fined $500.00, to be paid within thirty days of the Order becoming final. Failure to pay the fine within this period would result in suspension of licence until such time as the amount was paid.
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): 19 Apr 1991
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 27 May 1980
Summary:
In May 1980, Dr. Bhabha pleaded guilty to a charge of professional misconduct, as defined in s. 26(31) of Ontario Regulation 577/75, as amended, in that he engaged in conduct or an act relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. The Discipline Committee accepted this plea, and found Dr. Bhabha guilty of professional misconduct. Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. Bhabha's licence to practice be suspended for a period of three months, and that he be fined $5000.00. The Committee further ruled that, if Dr. Bhabha satisfied the College within three months of the Order becoming final that he had made all reasonable efforts to enter into new leasing arrangements so as to divest himself of any further conflict of interest, the penalty of suspension of the Doctor's licence would itself be suspended and replaced by a reprimand.
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): 27 May 1980