THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 16:44:43 PM
Nikore, Vinay Kumar
CPSO#:
22798
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
22 Jun 1970
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Jun 1970
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi
Education: All-India Institute of Medical Sciences, 1962
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
353 St Paul Avenue
Brantford ON N3R 4N3
Phone: (519) 759-5971
Fax: (519) 759-5971
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital Notices
Source: Hospital
Active Date: December 14, 2011
Expiry Date:
Summary:
On June 26, 2012, Brant Community Healthcare System notified the College that Dr. Vinay Kumar Nikore's privileges were temporarily suspended, effective December 14, 2011.
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:02 Dec 1969 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. VINAY KUMAR NIKORE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NIKORE is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1967 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Jun 1970 |