THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 20:57:00 PM
Carll, David John
CPSO#:
22781
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of
11 Aug 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
26 Jun 1970
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1969
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 25 Jun 1969 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Jun 1970 |
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee |
Effective: 30 Oct 2004 |
Suspension of registration removed |
Effective: 01 May 2005 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 11 Aug 2006 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 09 Jul 2002
Summary:
On July 9, 2002, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Carll guilty of professional misconduct in that he engaged in conduct relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional, in that he sexually harassed 7 female health care professionals, failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession as well as sexual impropriety with respect to examinations of two patients.
On September 13, 2002, the Discipline Committee ordered the following penalty:
1) Dr. Carll be reprimanded, the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the register
2) Twelve (12) month suspensioin, six (6) months of which to be suspended if Dr. Carll completes the College(s boudary course.
3) Costs to the College in the amount of $25,000.00
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: Appeal Dismissed
Appeal Decision Date: 2004-09-28
Hearing Date(s): May 22, 2001