THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 17:37:26 PM
Paterson, Ian Ross
CPSO#:
22764
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
31 Dec 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
08 Jun 1992
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1969
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact:
707 Kipps Lane
London, Ontario
N5Y 3C3
Date Received: 06 Jan 2011
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jun 1969 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jun 1970 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 08 Jun 1992 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 08 Jun 1992 |
Terms and conditions amended by Fitness to Practise Committee |
Effective: 06 Mar 1997 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 13 Oct 2010 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2010 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Fitness to Practice
Decision Date: 08 Jun 1992
Summary:
On June 8, 1992, the Fitness to Practice Committee found that Dr. Paterson is an incapacitated member of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario pursuant to subsection 63(1) of the Health Disciplines Act. On that date, the Fitness to Practice Committee ordered terms, conditions and limitations to be imposed on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Paterson.
On March 6, 1997, the Committee made an order amending these terms, conditions and limitations.
Appeal: No Appeal
Concerns
Source:
Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: December 31, 2010
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Effective December 31, 2010, Dr. Paterson has resigned from the College and has agreed not to apply or reapply for registration as a physician or for a licence to practise medicine in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.