THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 8:16:20 AM
Cauchi, Mario Mark
CPSO#:
22743
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
24 Aug 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
16 Apr 2003
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1969
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Mario Cauchi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 1 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1969 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jun 1970 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jun 1970 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 16 Apr 2003 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 16 Apr 2003 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 06 Aug 2003 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 15 Feb 2017 |
Terms and conditions amended by Quality Assurance Committee |
Effective: 04 Jun 2019 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 24 Aug 2020 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 20 Jan 2003
Summary:
On January 20, 2003, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Cauchi committed professional misconduct in that he falsified a record relating to his practice and committed an act of professional misconduct in that he engaged in conduct relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. The Committee reserved its decision on penalty.
On April 16, 2003, the Discipline Committee ordered and direct that:
1. Dr. Cauchi attend before the panel to be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the Register.
2. The Registrar suspend Dr. Cauchi(s certificate of registration for a period of three (3) months, commencing on May 1, 2003. Two (2) months of the suspension will be suspended on the condition that Dr. Cauchi successfully complete a course in ethics acceptable to the Registrar, the course to be completed by May 1, 2004.
3. The Registrar impose the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Cauchi(s certificate of registration for a period of three (3) years; Dr. Cauchi is not to practice as a sole practitioner in an independent practice and is to practice only in a setting acceptable to the Registrar with a partner or partners, supervisor or employer.
4. Dr. Cauchi pay a portion of the College(s costs, fixed in the amount of $2,500 by April 1, 2004.
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Jan 20, 2003
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 08 Oct 1999
Summary:
On October 8, 1999, the Discipline Committee accepted Dr. Cauchi(s plea of guilty and found him guilty of professional misconduct. The Committee ordered the following penalty:
1. Dr. Cauchi is to be reprimanded, the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the Register.
2. Dr. Cauchi is to pay $5,000.00 fine to the Minister of Finance.
3. Dr. Cauchi is to pay $3,000.00 in costs to the College.
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Oct 08, 1999
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: August 24, 2020
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Cauchi to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective August 24, 2020:
A College investigation into Dr. Cauchi’s practice was commenced. In the face of this investigation, Dr. Cauchi resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.
Download Full Document (PDF)