THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 21:33:03 PM
Williams, Robert Edward
CPSO#:
22717
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
15 Jun 1970
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1969
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:
Records Management Limited - Head Office
Unit 13
1 High Meadow Place
Toronto ON M9L 0A3
Toll Free: 1-800-775-0093
Website: www.recordregistry.ca
Date Received: 07 Aug 2014
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jul 1969 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1970 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2015 |
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: January 11, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Robert Edward Williams to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective January 11, 2016.
Dr. Williams has resigned from the College. Should Dr. Williams return to practice, he will not issue new prescriptions or renew existing prescriptions for any of the following substances:
(i)Narcotic Drugs (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19);
(ii)Narcotic Preparations (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19);
(iii)Controlled Drugs (from Schedule G of the Regulations under the Food and Drugs Act, S.C., 1985, c. F-27); or
(iv)Benzodiazepines/Other Targeted Substances (from the Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act., S.C., 1996, c. 19)
See PDF for full Undertaking.
Download Full Document (PDF)