THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 3:23:02 AM
Allen, Gillian Brook
CPSO#:
22684
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of
05 Aug 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
16 Jul 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Italian, Spanish
Education: University of Toronto, 1969
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 25 Jul 1969 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 May 1970 |
Suspension of registration imposed: Executive Committee |
Effective: 17 Nov 2000 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 01 Oct 2001 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Aug 2002 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 16 Jul 2009 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 16 Jul 2009 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 28 Apr 2010 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 05 Aug 2010 |