THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 4:06:17 AM
Vigneault, Maurice
CPSO#:
22664
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of
02 Aug 2002
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
20 Aug 2001
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Université Laval Faculté de Médecine, 1962
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Pathology |
Effective:15 Nov 1967 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 May 1970 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 25 Nov 1971 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Apr 1975 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 06 Jun 1995 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Aug 2001 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 02 Aug 2002 |