THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 6:38:35 AM
Smith, Gerald Dixon
CPSO#:
22635
MEMBER STATUS
Revoked: Discipline Committee as of
13 Mar 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
23 Apr 1970
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 1964
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Apr 1970 |
Revoked: Discipline Committee. |
Effective: 13 Mar 2006 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 26 Sep 2003
Summary:
On December 1, 2003, the Discipline Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario found that Dr. Gerald Dixon Smith committed acts of professional misconduct including sexual impropriety with a patient, failing to maintain the standard of practice of the profession and conduct or an act relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.
The Discipline Committee directed that Dr. Smith(s certificate of registration be revoked immediately, effective January 20, 2004. On January 21, 2004, Dr. Smith appealed to the Divisional Court. Pursuant to subsection 25(1) of the Statutory Powers Procedures Act, the decision of the Discipline Committee was stayed pending the outcome of the appeal.
On March 13, 2006, the Divisional Court dismissed Dr. Smith(s appeal.
Therefore, Dr. Smith(s certificate of registration in the Province of Ontario is revoked effective March 13, 2006 at 11:59 p.m.
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: Appeal Dismissed
Appeal Decision Date: 2006-03-13
Hearing Date(s): Dec 16, 2002