THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 17:46:18 PM
Gudgeon, Alfred Brian
CPSO#:
22526
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
27 Jul 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
20 Jan 1970
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
9-Sep-2011
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Leeds School of Medicine, 1961
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: A.B. Gudgeon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 19 2010
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc.
111 St. Regis Crescent S.
Toronto, Ontario
M3J 1Y6
Tel: (416) 398-0638
Toll Free: 1-888-563-3732
Fax: (416) 398-5932
Website: www.rsrs.com
Date Received: 17 Jun 2010
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Jul 1968 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Jan 1970 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 27 Jul 2010 |