THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 16:11:38 PM
Kontor, Jurgen Arthur
CPSO#:
22498
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of
11 Aug 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
17 Sep 1975
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, German
Education: University of Toronto, 1968
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. J. Kontor Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 26 2007
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Plastic Surgery |
Effective:17 Nov 1975 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Dec 1964 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 Dec 1969 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 06 Jan 1973 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Sep 1975 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 11 Aug 2007 |