THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 8:09:26 AM
Zelcer, Irving
CPSO#:
22484
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
10 Aug 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
23 Dec 1969
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
18-Apr-2019
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Yiddish
Education: University of Toronto, 1968
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients who are looking to request a copy of their medical records can send a written request to: [email protected].
Date Received: 05 Jul 2016
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1976 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1968 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Dec 1969 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 10 Aug 2016 |
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: August 10, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Irving Zelcer to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective August 10, 2016
.
Dr. Zelcer was the subject of a College investigation into whether he failed to maintain the standard of practice. During this investigation, Dr. Zelcer resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.
See PDF for full undertaking.
Download Full Document (PDF)