THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 18:46:19 PM
Jodrey, James Franklin
CPSO#:
22479
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of
26 Sep 1991
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1962
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Dec 1969 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 18 Aug 1970 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Dec 1985 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 19 Feb 1990 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 26 Sep 1991 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 09 Oct 1990
Summary:
In October 1990, Dr. Jodrey pleaded guilty to a charge of professional misconduct, as defined in s. 27(21) of Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession.
The Discipline Committee accepted this plea, and found Dr. Jodrey guilty of professional misconduct.
Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. Jodrey's licence to practice medicine be suspended for a minimum of three months, and until the following conditions were met: 1. that Dr. Jodrey was to consult with the Director of the Educational Department of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario regarding the appropriate assessment of his knowledge, skill and judgment in respect of the practice of medicine;
2. that as part of this assessment, Dr. Jodrey was to be referred by the Director of the Educational Department of the College to the McMaster Physician Review Program;
3. that Dr. Jodrey was to consent to the release by the College to the McMaster Physician Review Program of any
information considered appropriate by the Director of Education of the College prior to the assessment taking place;
4. that Dr. Jodrey was to attend the McMaster Physician Review Program and was to cooperate in every respect with the assessment provided by the Program;
5. that Dr. Jodrey was to consent to the release by the McMaster Physician Review Program to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario of any information with respect to the assessment and the result of the assessment as might be considered necessary by the Director of the Educational Department of the College;
6. that Dr. Jodrey was to complete any period of supervision and any program of upgrading which might be recommended by the Physician Review Program successfully and to the satisfaction of the Registrar, was to submit to such further reassessment or reassessments as might from time to time be recommended by the Physician Review Program, and was to complete any training, upgrading or period of supervision recommended by the Physician Review Program from time to time on the occasion of any reassessment or reassessments which might be recommended;
7. that Dr. Jodrey was to pay to the College the cost of his assessment at the McMaster Physician Review Program
forthwith after being invoiced at an amount determined by the Registrar of the College, not to exceed $8000.00; and
8. that the Registrar would determine when the terms and conditions had been satisfied, thereby ending the suspension of Dr. Jodrey's licence.
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): 09 Oct 1990