THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 18:25:26 PM
Wong, Daniel
CPSO#:
22458
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
27 Jun 1979
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Jun 1979
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Cantonese, English, Fukien, Mandarin, Taiwanese
Education: University of Manitoba, 1968
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
828 Dundas Street West
Toronto ON M6J 1V3
Phone: (416) 603-9009
Fax: 4165940384
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DANIEL WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Dec 1969 |
Revoked: Discipline Committee. |
Effective: 24 Nov 1977 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jun 1979 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 29 Jan 1980
Summary:
In January 1980, the Discipline Committee accepted Dr. Wong(s application for removal of restrictions from his licence.
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): 29 Jan 1980
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 08 Nov 1977
Summary:
In November 1977, Dr. Wong pleaded guilty to a charge of professional misconduct, as defined in Ontario Regulation 577/75, as amended, in that he made improper use of the authority to prescribe, sell or dispense a drug, including falsifying a record in respect of the prescription or sale of a drug, contrary to s. 26(25); and in that he engaged in conduct or an act relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional, contrary to s. 26(31). The Discipline Committee accepted this plea and found Dr. Wong guilty of professional misconduct. Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. Wong(s licence to practice be revoked.
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Nov 08, 1977
Application for Reinstatement
Decision Date: 09 Jan 1979
Decision: Application Accepted