THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 9:34:26 AM
Swift, Irene Mavis
CPSO#:
22412
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
11 Jun 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
21 Jun 1979
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of London, 1964
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1966 |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1966 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1967 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1967 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Oct 1969 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Oct 1969 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 05 Feb 1976 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 05 Feb 1976 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Jun 1979 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Jun 1979 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 11 Jun 2009 |