THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
17/04/24 19:18:26 PM
Crosby, David Ross Gordon
CPSO#:
22330
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
27 Jul 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
30 Jun 1982
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1963
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:16 Nov 1971 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:21 Nov 1972 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Sep 1969 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 30 Jul 1970 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 1982 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 27 Jul 2007 |