THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 11:05:33 AM
Caturay, Gregorio Resus
CPSO#:
22303
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Aug 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
17 May 1978
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Santo Tomas Faculty of Med, 1956
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:01 Jan 1971 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1962 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Aug 1969 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 15 May 1978 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 May 1978 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Aug 2008 |