THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 11:28:32 AM
Handscomb, Arthur Robert George
CPSO#:
22288
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
18 Jan 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Glasgow School of Medicine, 1960
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:01 Jan 1969 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Aug 1969 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 18 Jan 2008 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 18 Jan 2008 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2014 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 08 Sep 2008
Summary:
On September 8, 2008, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Handscomb to have committed acts of professional misconduct in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession. The Discipline Committee ordered the following:
1) that Dr. Handscomb appear before the Discipline Committee to be reprimanded, the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the register.
2) That Dr. Handscombe pay costs to the College in the amount of $3,650.00 by October 8, 2008.
3) Directs the results of this proceeding to be included in the register.
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Sep 08, 2008