THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 9:03:39 AM
Bendavid, Robert
CPSO#:
22178
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Member deceased as of
30 Sep 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
15 Jul 1969
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
30-Sep-2019
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Hebrew, Italian
Education: University of Manitoba, 1967
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Israel
Quebec
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:17 Jan 2013 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 12 Oct 1967 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jul 1969 |
Expired: Member deceased. |
Expiry date: 30 Sep 2019 |