THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 3:10:51 AM
Yau, Pak Choong
CPSO#:
22098
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Member deceased as of
23 Apr 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
20 Feb 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
23-Apr-2022
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Cantonese, Chinese, English, Italian
Education: Manchester Medical School, 1964
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. P.C. Yau Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 2 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Apr 1968 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jul 1969 |
Suspension of registration imposed: Executive Committee |
Effective: 23 Nov 2005 |
Suspension of registration removed |
Effective: 23 Jun 2006 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 05 Apr 2007 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Discipline Committee |
Effective: 05 Apr 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Jun 2008 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 20 Feb 2015 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 20 Feb 2015 |
Expired: Member deceased. |
Expiry date: 23 Apr 2022 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 05 Apr 2007
Summary:
1. On April 5, 2007, the Discipline found that Dr. Yau has committed an act of professional misconduct under paragraph 1(1)33 of Ontario Regulation 856/93 made pursuant to the Medicine Act, 1991, in that he engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct by renewing prescriptions for two patients while his certificate of registration was suspended. The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:
2. Dr. Yau appear before the panel to be reprimanded.
3. The results of this proceeding to be included in the register.
4. The Registrar impose the following term, condition and limitation on Dr. Yau's certificate of registration:
that Dr. Yau shall undergo and successfully complete to the satisfaction of the College an assessment under the direction of the College within twelve (12) months from the date of this Order. The assessment will be at Dr. Yau's expense and shall include, an observation component, consultation with his treating psychiatrist, and a chart review. Dr. Yau shall comply with any reasonable recommendations of the College that result from the assessment.
5. Dr. Yau shall within 30 days pay the College its costs of this proceeding in the amount of $2,500.00.
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Apr 05, 2007