THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 11:45:05 AM
Castelli, Mario Francesco
CPSO#:
22058
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jul 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
30 Jun 1969
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Italian
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1968
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Castelli Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 7 2014
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Greenestone Endoscopy Clinic
Unit 300
5734 Yonge Street
Toronto, ON M2M 4E7
Tel: 4162225501
Fax: 4162221932
Greenestone Endoscopy Clinic
Unit 320
790 Bay Street
Toronto, ON M5G 1N8
Tel: 4166135050
Fax: 4166135051
Date Received: 25 Jun 2014
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:05 Nov 1974 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1968 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 1969 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jul 2014 |
Concerns
Source:
Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: July 1, 2014
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Undertaking by Dr. Mario Francesco Castelli to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario (the “College”). (NOTE: This is a summary of the undertaking. For the complete terms, contact the College’s Membership Services Department):
I, Dr. Mario Francesco Castelli:
(2) Acknowledge that I was the subject of an investigation (the “Investigation”) by the College regarding whether I have maintained the standard of practice of the profession (the “Investigation”).
(3) Acknowledge that there has been no referral to the Discipline Committee of the College in respect of the Investigation.
(4) Acknowledge that I have resigned from the College effective July 1, 2014.
(6) Hereby undertake not to apply or re-apply for registration as a physician to practise medicine in Ontario or any other jurisdiction after the Effective Date.
(7) Agree that in the event that the College should become aware that I have either applied, re-applied or attempted to apply or re-apply for registration as a physician or for a certificate of registration to practise medicine in any jurisdiction after the Effective Date, the College shall have the right to proceed with a disciplinary proceeding on the basis of a breach of this undertaking and shall have the right to proceed with the Investigation it terminated as a result of this Undertaking and/or to proceed with a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Committee.
(11) Acknowledge that I shall be solely responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc., if any, arising from the implementation of any of the terms of this Undertaking.
(13) Give my irrevocable consent to the College to make appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person or institution who may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my compliance with the terms of this Undertaking.
(14) Consent to this undertaking being entered on the public register as information that is available to the public.