THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 16:00:17 PM
Fung, Yee Tsang
CPSO#:
22025
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jan 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
27 Jun 1969
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Cantonese, Chinese, English
Education: Li Ka Shing Faculty of Medicine, Univers, 1962
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:DocuDavit Solutions
28 Eugene Street
Toronto, Ontario
M6B 3Z4
Tel: (416) 781-9083
Toll Free: 1-888-781-9083
Fax: 1-866-297-9338
Website: http://www.docudavit.com
Date Received: 26 Feb 2008
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:02 Dec 1968 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1968 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jun 1969 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jan 2010 |